CAMBRIDGE UNIVERSITY MODERN PENTATHLON CLUB CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting athletes in pursuing the sport of Modern Pentathlon
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 05 April 2007: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CAHIR PAUL KING | Chair |
|
|
|||||
DANIEL JAMES TRENHOLM CARROLL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARK CHACKSFIELD | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.08k | £15.32k | £8.89k | £10.03k | £2.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.25k | £7.37k | £366 | £5.63k | £10.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 July 2024 | 253 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 December 2021 | 60 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 18 November 2020 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 FEBRUARY 2007.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY OF, STUDENT (INCLUDING POST GRADUATE STUDENT) MEMBERS OF CAMBRIDGE UNIVERSITY MODERN PENTATHLON CLUB ("CUPC") BY PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES, SUPPORT (INCLUDING FINANCIAL SUPPORT) AND FACILITIES IN ORDER THAT THEY MAY TAKE PART IN MODERN PENTATHLON ACTIVITIES IN ORDER TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 NEW SQUARE
LINCOLNS INN
LONDON
WC2A 3QP
- Phone:
- 08448754225
- Email:
- cahirking@hotmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window