Accounts and annual returns THE ERNEST FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1116823
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2024 01 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2024 01 May 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2023 08 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2023

(These accounts
have been qualified)

08 April 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2022 20 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2021 11 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 11 March 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2020 05 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not Required