THE CHRISTIAN WORSHIP PUBLISHING TRUST

Charity number: 1117057
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Advancement of the Christian religion mainly through the publication of a book of Christian Praise containing both Psalms and Hymns.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £21,680
Total expenditure: £16,917

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 November 2006: Standard registration
  • 16 November 2018: Funds received from 1017457 NORTH EARLHAM COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • CWPT (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev NEIL VICTOR PFEIFFER Chair
SALISBURY REFORMED SEMINARY
Received: On time
Rev JOHN MALCOLM SAUNDERS Trustee 05 June 2023
SALISBURY REFORMED SEMINARY
Received: On time
PROVIDENCE CHAPEL, CHICHESTER
Received: On time
Rev Thomas James Hayward Trustee 05 June 2023
Ebenezer Baptist Chapel
Received: On time
THE CHERITH TRUST
Received: On time
CHRISTIAN HERITAGE TRUST UK
Received: On time
Rev JONATHAN DAVID MUNDAY Trustee 04 June 2018
THE BIBLE LEAGUE TRUST
Received: On time
ROLAND BURROWS Trustee
SALISBURY REFORMED SEMINARY
Received: On time
CHRISTIAN HERITAGE TRUST UK
Received: On time
Rev John Peter Thackway Trustee
EMMANUEL CHURCH (SALISBURY)
Received: On time
THE BIBLE LEAGUE TRUST
Received: On time
THE TRINITARIAN BIBLE SOCIETY
Received: On time
HOLYWELL EVANGELICAL CHURCH
Received: On time
Rev DEWI WYN HIGHAM Trustee
TABERNACLE CARDIFF
Received: 14 days late
SALISBURY REFORMED SEMINARY
Received: On time
Rev DAVID WILLIAM KAY Trustee
WHIDDON VALLEY EVANGELICAL CHURCH
Received: On time
SALISBURY REFORMED SEMINARY
Received: On time
STEPHEN JAMES FORD Trustee
STANTON LEES CHAPEL
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £15.38k £4.38k £5.06k £13.27k £21.68k
Total expenditure £16.87k £1.01k £4.06k £8.92k £16.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 10 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 26 February 2024 26 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 09 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 17 March 2022 45 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 06 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
8 Pine Crescent
Minsterley
SHREWSBURY
SY5 0AY
Phone:
01743588407