Financial history CONWY DISTRICT CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU

Charity number: 1123006
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £443.57k £533.78k £548.51k £543.32k £665.61k
Total expenditure £417.97k £455.75k £514.89k £522.60k £635.52k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £127.70k £405.80k £98.61k £382.69k £306.79k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £2.80k £229 £1.17k £283
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0 £0 £15.00k
Income - Charitable activities N/A £530.98k £548.28k £542.16k £646.63k
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £0 £0 £0 £468
Income - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £3.24k
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £427.65k £472.46k £522.60k £635.52k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £91 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A £233 £2.52k £4.05k £11.73k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £13.98k £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £28.01k £42.43k £0 £0