FRANCIS GIFFEN MEMORIAL HALL

Charity number: 1117494
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Village Hall

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £11,375
Total expenditure: £19,957

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Northamptonshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 08 January 2007: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Kevin James McNally Trustee 20 October 2023
None on record
Ian James Whybrow Trustee 01 June 2023
None on record
Susan Margaret Green Trustee 01 June 2023
None on record
Victoria Feather Trustee 07 September 2022
None on record
Jenny Piazza Trustee 07 September 2022
None on record
Christopher John Featherstone Trustee 26 July 2022
THOMAS'S FUND
Received: On time
Simon Forde Trustee 27 January 2022
None on record
Toni Lesley Holtby Trustee 04 May 2021
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £2.67k £11.90k £16.81k £4.60k £11.38k
Total expenditure £1.41k £1.69k £15.26k £4.57k £19.96k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k £16.33k N/A £5.10k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 21 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 20 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 07 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 31 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 14 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Francis Giffen Memorial Hall
Main Street
Sudborough
NN14 3BX
Phone:
07702340964
Website:

No information available