WILD FISH CONSERVATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote conservation, protection and sustainable exploitation of salmon, trout and other fish stocks of UK origin, and the conservation and improvement of the aquatic environment and ecosystems necessary for them to thrive. To advance public education relating to the above. To promote and conduct research related to the above.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£923,076
Donations and legacies | £757.14k | |
Charitable activities | £101.63k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £11.75k | |
Other | £52.55k |
Total expenditure:
£1,060,813
Raising funds | £143.87k | |
Charitable activities | £916.95k | |
Other | £0 |
£1,165 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £143.87k | |
Charitable expenditure | £916.95k |
People

11 Employee(s)
13 Trustee(s)
210 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
£70k to £80k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 20 March 2008: Standard registration
- WildFish (Working name)
- SALMON & TROUT ASSOCIATION LIMITED (Previous name)
- SALMON & TROUT CONSERVATION UK (Previous name)
- SALMON & TROUT CONSERVATION UK (Previous name)
- WILD FISH CONSERVATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
William David Anthony Hicks KC | Chair | 11 September 2014 |
|
|||||
Robert John Walton KC | Trustee | 26 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lucinda Mantle | Trustee | 10 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Allan Digby Flower | Trustee | 25 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Philip Chessum | Trustee | 25 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR IAN GRAHAM COWX | Trustee | 05 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Philip Alastair Fairfax Studd | Trustee | 23 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Carl Derek Sayer | Trustee | 23 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert James Hollis | Trustee | 23 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Angela Webb | Trustee | 27 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Victor Beamish | Trustee | 28 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Simon Browne | Trustee | 28 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Neil Cooper | Trustee | 29 November 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £679.98k | £729.25k | £879.75k | £827.44k | £923.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £665.22k | £582.47k | £778.90k | £903.04k | £1.06m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £534.12k | £614.78k | £729.11k | £678.29k | £757.14k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £123.22k | £92.08k | £102.18k | £98.54k | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £101.63k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £8.89k | £6.03k | £6.93k | £7.50k | £11.75k | |
|
Income - Other | £13.75k | £16.36k | £41.54k | £43.11k | £52.55k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £8.95k | £80.00k | £93.51k | £59 | £56.96k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £578.57k | £514.89k | £680.99k | £743.56k | £916.95k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £86.66k | £67.58k | £97.92k | £159.47k | £143.87k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £30.49k | £32.66k | £27.83k | £31.54k | £50.18k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £9.72k | £3.96k | £7.58k | £7.50k | £3.81k | |
|
Long-term investments | £354.26k | £376.95k | £402.43k | £369.16k | £321.77k | |
|
Other assets | £285.85k | £437.21k | £454.03k | £366.22k | £277.30k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £118.76k | £126.43k | £46.49k | £51.15k | £47.72k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 09 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 14 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 14 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20/02/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/03/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/04/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/10/2012 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 04/08/2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23 SEP 2020 as amended on 05 Jul 2022
Charitable objects
1 TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND SUSTAINABLE EXPLOITATION OF SALMON, TROUT AND OTHER FISH STOCKS OF UNITED KINGDOM ORIGIN, AND THE CONSERVATION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE AQUATIC ENVIRONMENT AND ECOSYSTEMS NECESSARY FOR THEM TO THRIVE. 2 THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION RELATING TO THE CONSERVATION OF THE AQUATIC ENVIRONMENT AND THE INTERACTION BETWEEN HUMAN BEINGS, THE ENVIRONMENT AND FISH, WHETHER THROUGH ANGLING OR OTHERWISE; 3 TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TRAINING IN WATER SAFETY, KNOWLEDGE OF THE AQUATIC ENVIRONMENT AND IDENTIFICATION OF AND RESPECT FOR ITS DEPENDENT SPECIES, INCLUDING FISH, WHETHER THROUGH ANGLING OR OTHERWISE; 4 TO PROMOTE RESEARCH AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS THEREOF IN RESPECT OF THE FACTORS AFFECTING THE NATURAL AND ARTIFICIAL REGENERATION OF SALMON, TROUT AND OTHER FISHERIES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM INCLUDING THE GENERAL ECOLOGY OF RIVER CATCHMENTS AND THE MARINE ENVIRONMENT AND THE EFFECT OF COMMERCIAL, INDUSTRIAL AND LAND MANAGEMENT PRACTICE ON AQUATIC ECOSYSTEMS.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
Kingsgate House
North Wing
Ground Floor
Newbury Road
ANDOVER
Hampshir
- Phone:
- 07496 358 016
- Email:
- info@wildfish.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window