STOCKPORT AND DISTRICT MIND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing recovery and social inclusion services to people experiencing mental distress.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £26,665 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Stockport
Governance
- 21 May 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kay Day | Chair | 30 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Karen Beal | Trustee | 07 March 2025 |
|
|||||
Dr Keith Jeffery | Trustee | 07 March 2025 |
|
|||||
Peter Miles | Trustee | 01 August 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £194.00k | £255.90k | £220.71k | £369.60k | £186.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £228.00k | £234.40k | £237.71k | £275.13k | £276.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £74.80k | £74.00k | £74.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £19.00k | £1.00k | N/A | N/A | £26.67k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 02 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 01 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 04 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 04 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18 JULY 2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 22 FEBRUARY 2010. as amended on 06 Sep 2021 as amended on 14 Jan 2022 as amended on 14 Oct 2022
Charitable objects
4 The charity’s objects (‘Objects’) are specifically restricted to the following: • to promote the preservation of good mental health in particular by enabling and empowering everyone experiencing mental health problems to live with, manage and recover from their condition; • to relieve the needs of people with mental health problems by working to increase the understanding of mental health and mental health problems by gathering and disseminating information and working to raise awareness, promote understanding and challenge stigma and discrimination. In carrying out its objects, the charity will promote equality of opportunity and oppose any form of discrimination. The charity will provide services to achieve its objects, including but not restricted to advice, advocacy, training and other forms of support. [Nothing in the articles shall authorise an application of the property of the charity for purposes which are not charitable in accordance with section 7 of the Charities and Trustee Investment (Scotland) Act 2005 and/or section 2 of the Charities Act (Northern Ireland) 2008.]
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE STOCKPORT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Tameside Oldham & Glossop Mind
216-218 Katherine Street
ASHTON-UNDER-LYNE
Lancashire
OL6 7AS
- Phone:
- 01614807393
- Email:
- info@stockportmind.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window