FRIENDS OF EAST SUFFOLK PERFORMING ARTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
In East Suffolk area we provide grants to the Summer Theatres in Southwold and Aldeburgh, together with bursaries for students of the performing arts. These bursaries are awarded annually,are advertised locally and all applications are considered on merit by the trustees
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Suffolk
Governance
- 02 May 2007: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PHYLLIDA KATE HANCOCK | Trustee | 11 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Elizabeth Fisher | Trustee | 11 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Hegarty | Trustee | 19 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Jane Scott | Trustee | 19 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Ernest Rand | Trustee | 19 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Clark | Trustee | 14 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Christine Webb | Trustee | 13 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Tabor | Trustee | 15 March 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.07k | £15.42k | £9.63k | £6.52k | £8.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.49k | £12.20k | £4.48k | £14.34k | £17.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 18 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 APRIL 2006.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN THE FIELD OF THE PERFORMING ARTS FOR THE PEOPLE OF EAST SUFFOLK AND TO PROMOTE SUCH ARTS IN THE AREA FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY AND IN FURTHERANCE OF THE OBJECTS IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE ABOVE) (A) (I) BY PROMOTING PRACTICAL AND ACADEMIC TRAINING IN THE PERFORMING ARTS INCLUDING THEATRE AND STAGE MANAGEMENT: (II) BY FACILITATING, UNDERWRITING AND SUBSIDISING PUBLIC PERFORMANCES IN EAST SUFFOLK: (III) BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF A PUBLIC VENUE OR VENUES FOR PUBLIC PERFORMANCES: AND (IV) TO DO OTHER SUCH LAWFUL THINGS AS ARE INCIDENTAL OR CONDUCTIVE TO ATTAINMENT OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS (B) TO INVITE AND RECEIVE CONTRIBUTIONS FROM ANY PERSON OR ORGANISATION BY WAY OF SUBSCRIPTION OR DONATION: AND (C) SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
EAST SUFFOLK
Contact information
- Address:
-
74 Lowestoft Road
Reydon
SOUTHWOLD
IP18 6RF
- Phone:
- 07444798417
- Email:
- Beachhut1986@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window