Trustees FRIENDS OF EAST SUFFOLK PERFORMING ARTS

Charity number: 1119037
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PHYLLIDA KATE HANCOCK Trustee 11 April 2025
None on record
Caroline Elizabeth Fisher Trustee 11 April 2025
None on record
Barbara Hegarty Trustee 19 April 2024
None on record
Nicola Jane Scott Trustee 19 April 2024
None on record
James Ernest Rand Trustee 19 April 2024
None on record
Charlotte Clark Trustee 14 April 2023
REYDON VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
Christine Webb Trustee 13 August 2020
None on record
Margaret Tabor Trustee 15 March 2018
None on record