Financial history INTOUNI

Charity Number: 1118525
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £7.56m £8.85m £11.03m £11.32m £12.35m
Total expenditure £7.20m £8.10m £9.48m £10.85m £12.11m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £7.12m £8.65m £10.75m £11.22m £12.18m
Income - Other trading activities £306.25k £116.60k £133.55k £146.87k £24.30k
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £250.00k £1.00m £275.00k £12.18m
Income - Investment £55.06k £35.42k £69.70k £175.91k £274.84k
Income - Other £74.32k £44.17k £70.45k £53.76k £71.33k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £6.43m £7.39m £8.61m £10.01m £11.11m
Expenditure - Raising funds £694.08k £661.47k £796.50k £793.67k £923.47k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £58.45k £65.27k £66.20k £87.95k
Expenditure - Grants institution £190.00k £190.00k £190.00k £190.00k £190.00k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £74.32k £44.17k £70.45k £53.76k £71.33k