Accounts and annual returns THE LOPPYLUGS AND BARBARA MORRISON CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1118962
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 06 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 06 February 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2023 19 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 19 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2022 03 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 03 February 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2021 12 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 12 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2020 28 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 28 February 2021 On Time Download Open in new window