Financial history BEDFORD MESSIAH CHOIR

Charity number: 1117616
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £5.70k £1 £9.33k £6.09k £6.28k
Total expenditure £5.40k £86 £9.70k £5.57k £5.69k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A