TRINITY FAMILY CENTRE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Parent & Toddler group 3 x a week - play facilities, creative learning. Family club - promoting family values, sports - computers - cost price meals. Pensioners group for socially isolated. 1 session a week for adults with learning disabilities. Community cafe at affordable prices. Community food store, fridge & freezer.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £6,000 from 2 government contract(s) and £6,000 from 2 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
22 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Southend-on-sea
Governance
- 23 May 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
VIVIEN ROBSON BA HONS | Chair |
|
||||||
Kevin Reubin Robinson | Trustee | 21 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ellen Dansoa Ofori | Trustee | 21 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN ANNE MCCAMLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JACQUELINE ADELE WALTON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £96.55k | £76.19k | £86.45k | £88.13k | £98.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £93.68k | £66.27k | £86.31k | £92.14k | £91.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £24.00k | N/A | N/A | £6.00k | |
|
Income from government grants | £24.00k | £30.29k | N/A | N/A | £6.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 February 2024 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 08 February 2024 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 1 NOVEMBER 2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 24 APRIL 2007.
Charitable objects
TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY OF THE MEMBERS OF THE SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITY OF WESTCLIFF-ON-SEA, AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION, TRAINING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT, WITH THE OBJECT OF DEVELOPING THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES, THAT THEY GROW TO FULL CAPACITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY. TO PROVIDE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF WESTCLIFF-ON-SEA AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES, BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
COMMUNITY OF WESTCLIFF-ON-SEA, AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
TRINITY METHODIST CHURCH
ARGYLL ROAD
WESTCLIFF-ON-SEA
SS0 7HL
- Phone:
- 01702351998
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window