DYSLEXIA EAST KENT SUPPORT (DEKS)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
D.E.K.S. hold occasional talks on subjects relating to dyslexia. A Drop-in Centre is held from 2pm to 4pm on the first Saturday of the month. There is a library of books and resources, from which members can borrow. A telephone helpline, website and email, enable people to access information about dyslexia and the help that can be obtained.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kent
Governance
- 14 June 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ARLENE KIM WAKE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
SUSAN ELIZABETH FLORY | Trustee | 27 November 2011 |
|
|||||
ALWYN LINDLEY | Trustee | 27 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Whiteside | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARIAN ELIZABETH MCCORMICK | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.05k | £840 | £2.40k | £1.43k | £1.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.52k | £12.58k | £8.44k | £2.86k | £3.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 21 NOVEMBER 2006 AS AMENDED ON 19 MAY 2007
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PERSONS WITH DYSLEXIA BY THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT, EDUCATION AND INFORMATION. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN ALL AREAS RELATING TO DYSLEXIA IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, TO PARENTS AND TEACHERS OF DYSLEXIC CHILDREN.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE EAST KENT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Suite 14, Lullingstone House Offices
Lullingstone Court
St. Johns Lane
CANTERBURY
Kent
CT1 2NX
- Phone:
- 08450038979
- Email:
- dyslexiaeastkent@gmail.com
- Website:
-
dyslexia-east-kent.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window