Financial history VOLUNTARY ACTION MERTHYR TYDFIL

Charity number: 1118403
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.15m £1.21m £1.02m £998.79k £1.07m
Total expenditure £1.08m £954.67k £867.87k £1.02m £894.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £51.25k £191.60k £163.98k £84.57k £26.67k
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £700
Income - Other trading activities £73.71k £75.05k £3.04k £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.07m £1.13m £971.54k £935.97k £1.01m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.10k £2.48k £2.44k £4.47k £12.21k
Income - Other £6.13k £2.66k £39.59k £58.35k £39.21k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £700
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.08m £954.67k £867.87k £1.02m £894.81k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0