Financial history THE ASSOCIATION OF COLOPROCTOLOGY OF GREAT BRITAIN AND IRELAND

Charity number: 1118063
Charity reporting is up to date (103 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £1.49m £583.09k £778.44k £1.18m £1.36m
Total expenditure £1.48m £655.94k £623.50k £1.02m £1.03m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £505.95k £65.16k £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £250.17k £128.34k £291.44k £295.83k £276.25k
Income - Charitable activities £735.68k £388.68k £486.91k £882.43k £1.08m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.94k £904 £94 £2.32k £2.14k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.34m £596.69k £623.50k £1.02m £1.03m
Expenditure - Raising funds £101.71k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £42.08k £193.21k £180.18k £223.50k £207.71k
Expenditure - Grants institution £501.78k £63.60k £443.32k £10.00k £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £38.52k £59.25k £0 £0 £0