Trustees THE ASSOCIATION OF COLOPROCTOLOGY OF GREAT BRITAIN AND IRELAND

Charity number: 1118063
Charity reporting is up to date (103 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Laura Hancock Trustee 03 July 2024
None on record
James Wheeler Trustee 01 January 2024
None on record
Jennifer Louise Burch Trustee 01 January 2024
None on record
James Hill Trustee 14 August 2023
None on record
Dr Richard Justin Davies Trustee 04 July 2023
None on record
David McArthur Trustee 04 July 2023
None on record
Dr Timothy Alan Cook Trustee 01 January 2023
None on record
Baljit Singh Trustee 01 January 2023
None on record
Dr Karen Patricia Nugent Trustee 01 June 2021
None on record
Professor Howard Lewis Young FRCS ChM Trustee 02 October 2019
None on record
Maria Bentley Trustee 27 July 2018
None on record
Mrs Anne Demick Trustee 11 July 2018
None on record
JONATHAN PETER BELL Trustee 09 October 2017
None on record