THE ANN HILL RESEARCH TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. Making grants to individuals and organisations for research in complementary medicine. 2. Making grants to organisations to educate the public in complementary medicine.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 28 November 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr DAVID IAN DOWSON | Chair | 01 January 2008 |
|
|
||||
Janet Frances Spence | Trustee | 11 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Michael Robson | Trustee | 11 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Janet Snowdon | Trustee | 09 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr RICHARD LLOYD WHARTON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £394 | £135 | £0 | £0 | £250 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.06k | £260 | £0 | £182 | £80.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 January 2021 | 87 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 8 OCTOBER 2007
Charitable objects
A) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC INTO THE SCOPE, USE AND MODE OF OPERATION OF COMPLEMENTARY MEDICINE. B) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS BY THE EDUCATION OF MEMBERS OF THE MEDICAL AND ALLIED PROFESSIONS INTO THE SCOPE, USE AND MODE OF OPERATION OF COMPLEMENTARY MEDICINE. C) THE FUNDING OF RESEARCH INTO THE TREATMENT OF DISEASE AND ILLNESS USING COMPLEMENTARY MEDICINE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT. D) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN INTO THE USE OF HOMEOPATHIC MEDICINE IN THE TREATMENT OF ALLERGIES.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
HAMSWELL FARM
HAMSWELL
BATH
BA1 9DG
- Phone:
- 07595366820
- Email:
- hamswell@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window