ESO (2006) LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ESO is a professional orchestra. It performs in concerts, mainly around the Midlands, in ensembles from quartet to string orchestra to full symphony orchestra. ESO runs orchestra courses for players from grade 1 onwards and takes part in side-by-side projects with local county youth orchestras. ESO is conscious of its place in the community and works closely with local companies and charities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income includes £69,750 from 1 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 12 June 2007: Standard registration
- 11 June 2014: Funds received from 1024824 FRIENDS OF THE ENGLISH SYMPHONY ORCHESTRA
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Allan James Walker | Trustee | 28 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Finn Heathfield | Trustee | 26 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Capaldi | Trustee | 26 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
DAVID BLAKE | Trustee | 29 May 2020 |
|
|||||
RICHARD JULIAN ADEY | Trustee | 07 February 2020 |
|
|||||
Dr Christopher Andrew Barnett MBE | Trustee | 30 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Godfrey | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|||||
MELANNE MUELLER | Trustee | 10 April 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £312.50k | £407.90k | £748.26k | £671.35k | £467.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £228.26k | £452.95k | £675.54k | £622.84k | £501.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £8.00k | £150.91k | £111.85k | £105.95k | £69.75k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £388.88k | £343.96k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £9.70k | £3.30k | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £284.33k | £323.84k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £0 | £252 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £65.35k | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £675.54k | £622.84k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £6.46k | £6.60k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 07 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 07 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 20 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 20 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 15 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 15 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 26 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 26 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 17 AUGUST 2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 21 MAY 2007.
Charitable objects
3. THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (THE OBJECTS) ARE (1) TO ADVANCE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN, AND APPRECIATION OF, THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN PARTICULAR THE ART OF CLASSICAL MUSIC BY ANY MEANS AS THE DIRECTORS SEE FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Elgar School of Music
16-20 Deansway
Worcester
WR1 2ES
- Phone:
- 01905 918855
- Email:
- info@eso.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window