WELL OF TORAH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of the Orthodox Jewish Faith The advancement of Orthodox Jewish Religious Education The releif of poverty, sickness and infirmity amongst members of the Jewish faith
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 14 March 2007: Standard registration
- 23 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
- 07 October 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Naftoli lieberman | Trustee | 22 January 2015 |
|
|||||
Avram Guttentag | Trustee | 22 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
SHAMAI SCHLEIDER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
YEHUDA SCHLEIDER | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £138.04k | £151.47k | £146.69k | £308.15k | £245.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £125.46k | £151.76k | £149.34k | £285.90k | £263.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 15 FEBRUARY 2007
Charitable objects
(I) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ORTHODOX JEWISH FAITH (II) THE ADVANCEMENT OF ORTHODOX JEWISH RELIGIOUS EDUCATION (III) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY SICKNESS AND INFIRMITY AMONGST MEMBERS OF THE JEWISH FAITH AND (IV) SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS ARE CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO ENGLISH LAW
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 HARTINGTON STREET
GATESHEAD
NE8 4EN
- Phone:
- 01914773911
- Email:
- welloftorah@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window