THE COBWEB ORCHESTRA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Cobweb Orchestra operates as a community orchestra for all abilities and ages. The Cobweb Orchestra aims to advance, improve, develop and maintain public eduction in, and appreciation of, the art and science of music in all its aspects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- City Of York
- Cumbria
- Durham
- Gateshead
- Middlesbrough
- Northumberland
Governance
- 11 April 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Margaret Perenna Rogers | Trustee | 20 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Paul David Alan Mills | Trustee | 15 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Willmore | Trustee | 15 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Lesley Wearmouth | Trustee | 15 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW WILLIAM NEIL FORSYTH | Trustee | 16 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Dr Silvia Orr | Trustee | 16 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Catherine Preston | Trustee | 16 October 2021 |
|
|||||
Susan Baker | Trustee | 16 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Emma Jane Pearson | Trustee | 22 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Samuel David Baines | Trustee | 21 September 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 01/04/2022 | 01/04/2023 | 01/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £77.87k | £28.37k | £43.11k | £71.90k | £79.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £76.18k | £22.91k | £47.17k | £72.70k | £84.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 20 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 20 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLED INCORPORATED 6 JANUARY 2007 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 12 JUNE 2010.
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS ARE TO ADVANCE, IMPROVE DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN, AND APPRECIATION OF, THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
28 College View
CONSETT
County Durham
DH8 7DP
- Phone:
- 01913866355
- Email:
- roo.tanner@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window