THE J W SLY AND SONS (NORTHLEACH) CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main aim of the Charity is to provide affordable housing within the parish of Northleach, Gloucestershire for the benefit of employees employed within Community Facilities and Services e.g. but not exclusively schools, shops & churches. It also aims to support local family life within the communityalso to support students within the parish requiring financial assistance with course literature.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 18 June 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrea Jane Richell | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||||||||
Emily Jayne Hartnell | Trustee | 12 April 2017 |
|
|
||||||||||
Laura Jane Blundell | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||||||||
RICHARD CHARLES OWEN | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|||||||||||
DAVID M LOUISSON | Trustee | 30 May 2012 |
|
|||||||||||
CHRISTOPHER HANCOCK | Trustee |
|
||||||||||||
FELICITY DORA ERICSSON EBSWORTH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||
ENID GRACE SLY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||
IAN PATRICK SANDERS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||
DAVID GORDON EBSWORTH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £117.44k | £838.31k | £99.87k | £76.92k | £136.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £34.51k | £57.50k | £71.33k | £78.19k | £68.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £779.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £53.16k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £6.13k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £19 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £534.50k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £54.25k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £3.25k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £1.28k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £3.25k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 28 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 28 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 29 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 29 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 09 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 09 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 27 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 27 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 16 MAY 2007
Charitable objects
3.1 TO RELIEVE POVERTY IN NORTHLEACH BY: . PROVIDING AFFORDABLE HOUSING FOR THOSE IN NEED; AND/OR . MAKING GRANTS TO OTHER CHARITIES AND NOT-FOR-PROFIT ORGANISATIONS OPERATING IN NORTHLEACH. PROVIDED THAT IF THE TRUSTEES CONSIDER THAT THERE ARE INSUFFICIENT PEOPLE IN NEED IN NORTHLEACH THEN TO RELIEVE POVERTY BY THE SAME MEANS IN THE SURROUNDING VILLAGES OF SHERBORNE, WINDRUSH, CHEDWORTH AND BIBURY AND OTHER NEIGHBOURING VILLAGES AT THE DISCRETION OF THE TRUSTEES. 3.2 TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY: . REFURBISHING BUILDINGS AT WHEELWRIGHTS, WEST END, NORTHLEACH, GLOUCESTERSHIRE AND MAINTAINING IT AS A MUSEUM OF THE HISTORY OF GLOUCESTERSHIRE LIFE AND CRAFTS; AND/OR . MAKING GRANTS TO OTHER CHARITIES AND NOT-FOR-PROFIT ORGANISATIONS OPERATING IN NORTHLEACH. 3.3 TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY MAKING GRANTS TO ST PETER AND ST PAUL'S CHURCH, NORTHLEACH AND OTHER CHURCHES IN THE NORTHLEACH BENEFICE AT THE DISCRETION OF THE TRUSTEES...
Area of benefit
GLOUCESTERSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHURCH BARN
MILL END
NORTHLEACH
CHELTENHAM
GL54 3HJ
- Phone:
- 01451860608
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window