ANTON U3A

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Monthly meetings with speaker, raffle and refreshments. Interest groups in a wide range of areas from computers to french conversation
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hampshire
Governance
- 02 April 2007: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sharon King | Chair | 12 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Cunniffe | Trustee | 10 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Cecil Rose | Trustee | 12 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jean Saunders | Trustee | 08 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anne Bray | Trustee | 10 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Barbie Morrey-Stone | Trustee | 10 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Tessa Cross | Trustee | 13 June 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.47k | £1.03k | £4.03k | £8.25k | £8.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.72k | £1.19k | £5.49k | £5.87k | £7.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12/06/2006 AS AMENDED ON 13/08/2008 AS AMENDED ON 08/06/2011 AS AMENDED ON 13 JUN 2018 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 12 JUL 2018
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK, BY ALL MEANS INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT.
Area of benefit
ANDOVER
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 Blossom Close
ANDOVER
Hampshire
SP10 3RR
- Phone:
- 01264562637
- Email:
- cecilrose1@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window