LANCASHIRE FORUM OF FAITHS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We work in partnership with and promote and support Interfaith activity and Organisations in Lancashire with partners such as Lancashire County Council (helping develop an Equality and Diversity staff training package), the District Councils, Lancashire Constabulary (working on 'the prevention of violent extremism' agenda), the Primary Care Trusts, Churches Together in Lancashire .
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Blackburn With Darwen
- Blackpool
- Lancashire
Governance
- 13 April 2007: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDREW PRATT | Chair | 04 December 2013 |
|
|||||
Amy Troner | Trustee | 07 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Shreya Ghodke | Trustee | 07 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Callaghan | Trustee | 07 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Marion Pollitt Mrs | Trustee | 06 May 2021 |
|
|||||
Hardeep Kaur Singh Mrs | Trustee | 06 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
PETER LUMSDEN | Trustee | 04 December 2011 |
|
|||||
Charubala Ainscough | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £951 | £951 | £6.87k | £6.22k | £6.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £35 | £35 | £4.18k | £642 | £40 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 12 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6 DECEMBER 2006
Charitable objects
1 TO ADVANCE PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE AND MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING OF THE TEACHINGS, TRADITIONS AND PRACTICES OF THE DIFFERENT FAITH COMMUNITIES, PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN LANCASHIRE, BLACKBURN AND BLACKPOOL; INCLUDING AN AWARENESS BOTH OF THEIR DISTINCTIVE FEATURES AND THEIR COMMON GROUND AND TO PROMOTE GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT FAITHS. 2 IN FURTHERANCE OF THE SAID PURPOSES BUT NOT OTHERWISE, TO PROMOTE AND ORGANISE COOPERATION IN THE ACHIEVEMENT OF THE SAME AND TO THAT END TO BRING TOGETHER REPRESENTATIVES OF THE VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND STATUTORY AUTHORITIES IN THE SAID AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
LANCASHIRE, BLACKBURN AND BLACKPOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
RYDAL MOUNT
WOODPLUMPTON ROAD
WOODPLUMPTON
PRESTON
PR4 0NE
- Phone:
- 07710420530
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window