Financial history Relationship and Family Therapy (RAFT) Ltd

Charity Number: 1120017
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £159.89k £159.15k £185.60k £197.23k £149.52k
Total expenditure £171.13k £163.54k £171.56k £182.32k £173.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £70.00k N/A