Relationship and Family Therapy (RAFT) Ltd
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
RELATE BOURNEMOUTH PROVIDES A RANGE OF SERVICES TO PROMOTE AND SUPPORT RELATIONSHIPS. THESE SERVICES INCLUDE RELATIONSHIP COUNSELLING, FAMILY COUNSELLING, SEX THERAPY, SERVICES FOR CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE. EMOTIONAL SUPPORT SERVICES, LIFESKILLS TRAINING AND DEVELOPMENT AND MEDIATION.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bournemouth
- Dorset
- Hampshire
- Poole
Governance
- RELATE BOURNEMOUTH POOLE & CHRISTCHURCH (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Cook | Chair | 15 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Nicole Jessop | Trustee | 18 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Debra Clark | Trustee | 12 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dorothy Brown | Trustee | 13 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Wheeler | Trustee | 29 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
ANNE CLARKSON | Trustee | 29 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jackie Reeves | Trustee | 20 August 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £159.89k | £159.15k | £185.60k | £197.23k | £149.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £171.13k | £163.54k | £171.56k | £182.32k | £173.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £70.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 10 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION 15 FEB 2007, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 15 JUL 2010. as amended on 25 Mar 2025
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC CONCERNING THE BENEFITS OF SECURE COUPLE RELATIONSHIPS, MARRIAGE AND FAMILY LIFE IN ORDER TO IMPROVE THE EMOTIONAL, SEXUAL AND SPIRITUAL WELL-BEING OF INDIVIDUALS WHICH IS DERIVED FROM COMMITTED RELATIONSHIPS. (FOR MORE DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 4 OF ARTICLES)
Area of benefit
BOURNEMOUTH
Contact information
- Address:
-
1
Stratfield Saye
20-22 Wellington Road
Bournemouth
- Phone:
- 01202311231
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window