AMMAN VALLEY RAILWAY SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Preserving the industrial and railway heritage of the amman valley, and to promote and encourage their useage for the benefit and education of the communities it serves and the general public
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Carmarthenshire
- City Of Swansea
- Neath Port Talbot
Governance
- 11 June 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Carl Richards | Trustee | 14 December 2018 |
|
|||||
John David Stonehouse | Trustee | 14 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Thomas Adrian Sheppard | Trustee | 14 December 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.40k | £23.39k | £10.13k | £3.19k | £2.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.34k | £5.30k | £5.09k | £4.42k | £1.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £19.00k | £6.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 31 December 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 25 MAY 2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 2 MAY 2007.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE RESTORATION AND OPERATION OF THE RAILWAY IN THE AMMAN VALLEY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND THROUGH THE PROMOTION AND ENCOURAGEMENT OF VOLUNTARY WORK IN SUPPORT OF THE SAID RAILWAY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE CARMARTHENSHIRE, NEATH AND PORT TALBOT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 Quay Street
Ammanford
Dyfed
SA18 3DB
- Phone:
- 01269608635
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window