THE SNOWFLAKE TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of emergency accommodation over winter nights
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- East Sussex
Governance
- 20 June 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Charles Crighton | Chair | 28 August 2013 | ||||||
Jacqueline Jean Edwards | Trustee | 21 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
James Mellors | Trustee | 11 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joseph Robert Constantinos Cornford-Hutchings | Trustee | 27 April 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £64.71k | £18.72k | £17.86k | £106.31k | £23.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £63.60k | £19.53k | £23.75k | £37.49k | £36.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £76.60k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 28 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 23 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 23 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 05 April 2023 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 06 August 2022 | 128 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 12 May 2021 | 42 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 12 May 2021 | 42 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES ASSOCIATION, DATED 28 SEPTEMBER 2006
Charitable objects
3.1 TO PROVIDE AND PROMOTE THE PROVISION OF ACCOMMODATION SHELTER AND HOUSING AND ANY ANCILLARY FACILITIES, FOOD, CLOTHING, PHYSICAL, MENTAL, EDUCATIONAL AND SPIRITUAL CARE AND SUPPORT FOR PEOPLE WHO THROUGH AGE, PHYSICAL OR MENTAL ILLNESS, YOUTH, ALCOHOL, OR DRUG ADDITION OR DEPENDENCY, AND/OR POVERTY ARE UNABLE TO MAKE ADEQUATE PROVISION FOR THEMSELVES. 3.2 TO PROVIDE AND ENCOURAGE THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR MEDICAL REHABILITATION AND TREATMENT, SPIRITUAL HELP AND GUIDANCE AND EDUCATION AND TRAINING.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, EAST SUSSEX
Contact information
- Address:
-
25 Boscobel Road North
St. Leonards-on-Sea
TN38 0NY
- Phone:
- 07547482627
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window