THE CHERIE BLAIR FOUNDATION FOR WOMEN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Working in partnership with non-profit organisations, corporations and government bodies, the Cherie Blair Foundation for Women develops projects with sustainable solutions to the challenges women entrepreneurs face through three programmes: Enterprise Development, Mentoring and Mobile Technology.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£1,872,878
Donations and legacies | £604.67k | |
Charitable activities | £1.26m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £5.06k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£2,405,778
Raising funds | £658.39k | |
Charitable activities | £1.75m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £658.39k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.75m |
People

23 Employee(s)
7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 3 |
£70k to £80k | 1 |
£80k to £90k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Albania
- Angola
- Argentina
- Armenia
- Azerbaijan
- Belarus
- Bolivia
- Bosnia And Herzegovina
- Brazil
- Burundi
- Cambodia
- Cameroon
- China
- Colombia
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
- Costa Rica
- Croatia
- Dominican Republic
- Egypt
- Ethiopia
- Fiji
- Georgia
- Ghana
- Grenada
- Guatemala
- India
- Indonesia
- Israel
- Ivory Coast
- Jamaica
- Kazakhstan
- Kenya
- Kosovo
- Lebanon
- Lesotho
- Macedonia
- Madagascar
- Malawi
- Malaysia
- Mexico
- Moldova
- Montenegro
- Morocco
- Namibia
- Nepal
- Nicaragua
- Nigeria
- Occupied Palestinian Territories
- Pakistan
- Papua New Guinea
- Peru
- Philippines
- Rwanda
- Serbia
- Sierra Leone
- South Africa
- Tanzania
- The Bahamas
- Turkey
- Uganda
- Ukraine
- United Arab Emirates
- Uzbekistan
- Vietnam
- Zambia
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 08 September 2008: Standard registration
- THE CHERIE BLAIR WOMEN'S FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tanya Joseph | Chair | 20 March 2020 |
|
|||||
Jyotiben Kanani | Trustee | 02 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Angela Salt | Trustee | 27 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Woolnough | Trustee | 27 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Winnie Wambugu | Trustee | 05 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Ehlers | Trustee | 27 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER JOHN LANE | Trustee | 16 September 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.79m | £2.02m | £2.18m | £1.97m | £1.87m | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.82m | £1.96m | £2.10m | £2.09m | £2.41m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £404.74k | £598.73k | £820.31k | £773.59k | £604.67k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.38m | £1.42m | £1.36m | £1.19m | £1.26m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £5.29k | £266 | £57 | £629 | £5.06k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £2.39m | £1.57m | £1.71m | £1.57m | £1.75m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £431.25k | £392.15k | £396.03k | £514.51k | £658.39k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £38.17k | £16.00k | £63.52k | £69.99k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £235.63k | £508.12k | £512.83k | £420.68k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £27.57k | £61.70k | £72.94k | £36.50k | £25.19k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £1.23m | £1.20m | £1.73m | £1.82m | £1.26m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £80.56k | £69.02k | £513.76k | £543.45k | £545.52k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 23 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 05 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 01 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 2 APRIL 2007
Charitable objects
A) TO PROMOTE EQUALITY, IN PARTICULAR, BETWEEN WOMEN AND MEN AND TO ELIMINATE GENDER AND OTHER FORMS OF DISCRIMINATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC; B) TO RELIEVE THE POVERTY AND SICKNESS OF WOMEN AND CHILDREN AND TO PROMOTE AND TO PROTECT THEIR HEALTH (WHETHER MENTAL, PHYSICAL, SEXUAL OR EMOTIONAL); C) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF WOMEN AND CHILDREN; AND D) TO CARRY OUT SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE EDUCATION AND RESEARCH PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT ("THE OBJECTS").
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
30 Harcourt Street
Marylebone
London
W1H 4HU
- Phone:
- 02077243109
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window