MYHEALTHNET LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Young People Sexual Health Service Training & Education Programmes Service Summary: Sexual/Reproductive/Assualt/Psychosexual advice Testing/Partner notification Counselling Workshops & Seminar Health promotion Condoms distribution Support & supervision Volunteering Partnership Contact:secretary@myhealthnet.org.uk T: 08454301904 Counsellor: 07947557567 E: auntclara@myhealthnet.org.uk
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Barking And Dagenham
- Bexley
- Bromley
- City Of London
- Greenwich
- Kent
- Lambeth
- Lewisham
- Southwark
- Tower Hamlets
Governance
- 04 August 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Khannie Jitta Saccoh | Trustee | 29 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Daniela Francisca Stracker | Trustee | 29 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Frank Victor Oakes-Paris | Trustee | 29 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Carol Igomabo Selema | Trustee | 29 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Fatumata Gassama | Trustee |
|
||||||
CLARA SOGUNRO-KOKO | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.04k | £3.91k | £3.10k | £3.11k | £3.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.91k | £2.49k | £3.06k | £3.10k | £3.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 19 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 22 May 2024 | 83 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 05 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 02 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 12 March 2021 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18 APRIL 2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 25 JANUARY 2008
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT GOOD HEALTH, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY RELATING TO SEXUAL AND REPRODUCTIVE HEALTH EDUCATION.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 LARCH ROAD
DARTFORD
DA1 2LE
- Phone:
- 08454301904
- Email:
- info@myhealthnet.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window