OMEGA – ENDING ISOLATION, ENDING LONELINESS LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Omega is based in the West Midlands. Its objects are to provide personalised befriending and support services by telephone, mail and social media, to establish and support groups to meet physically or by other means to address issues associated with isolation and loneliness, and to collaborate with other agencies working to similar ends to enhance provision and effectiveness.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £10,604 from 2 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
485 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 30 July 2007: Standard registration
- OMEGA, THE NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR END OF LIFE CARE (Previous name)
- THE NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR END OF LIFE CARE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Inderjit Singh Gill | Trustee | 29 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Susan Barber | Trustee | 24 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
ANGUS AUSTIN GREGORY | Trustee | 23 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christine Carole Ann Davies | Trustee | 11 September 2019 |
|
|||||
David John James | Trustee | 20 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
LINTON WATERS | Trustee | 24 January 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £137.86k | £265.51k | £310.40k | £256.99k | £283.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £133.58k | £237.00k | £293.00k | £281.61k | £224.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.63k | £12.25k | N/A | £12.82k | £10.60k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 11 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 08 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 01 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 2 APRIL 2007. AS AMENDED ON 24 MAR 2024 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14 AUG 2024
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS (“THE OBJECTS”) ARE TO WORK TOWARDS ENDING SOCIAL ISOLATION AND THE DETRIMENTAL EFFECTS OF LONELINESS AMONGST ADULTS. ACTIVITIES TO ACHIEVE THESE WILL INCLUDE: A. WORKING WITH A WIDE RANGE OF SELECTED REFERRERS TO IDENTIFY ADULTS SUFFERING FROM THE EFFECTS OF LONELINESS AND SOCIAL ISOLATION; B. PROVIDING PERSONALISED BEFRIENDING AND SUPPORT SERVICES BY TELEPHONE, MAIL AND SOCIAL MEDIA; C. ESTABLISHING AND SUPPORTING GROUPS TO MEET PHYSICALLY OR BY OTHER MEANS TO ADDRESS ISSUES ASSOCIATED WITH ISOLATION AND LONELINESS; D. COLLABORATING WITH OTHER AGENCIES WORKING TO SIMILAR ENDS TO ENHANCE PROVISION AND EFFECTIVENESS. E. PROVIDE AID TO ELDERLY AND TERMINALLY ILL CLIENTS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
LONDON HOUSE
TOWN WALLS
SHREWSBURY
SY1 1TX
- Phone:
- 01743245088
- Email:
- INFO@OMEGA.UK.NET
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window