SUTTON VALENCE CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Public Education in Music
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Kent
Governance
- 11 May 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Margaret Alison Jordan | Chair | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Josephine Mary Baughan | Trustee | 18 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Paul Mann | Trustee | 06 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Mary Monckton | Trustee | 06 November 2023 |
|
|||||
ANDREW JAMES HUTCHINSON | Trustee | 01 May 2016 |
|
|||||
PAMELA HIPKINS | Trustee | 31 May 2011 |
|
|||||
MS JANE HILL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MS LIZ BLOOM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JULIA JEAN IRELAND | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.19k | £3.94k | £10.71k | £13.60k | £24.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.23k | £2.45k | £10.88k | £14.61k | £16.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 11 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 01 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 14 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 10 June 2021 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19/02/2007 AS AMENDED ON 29/06/2009 AS AMENDED ON 07/11/2011
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN, AND APPRECIATION OF, THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY ANY MEANS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS; TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SHALL THINK FIT BUT IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE MAKING OF GRANTS AND DONATIONS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, KENT
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Manse
Chapel Road
Sutton Valence
MAIDSTONE
Kent
ME17 3AH
- Phone:
- 01622843325
- Email:
- hutchaa82@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window