THE TWIST PROJECT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a Charity organization in the area of Pinehurst and Penhill. In both area's we hold free open play sessions for 6 -14 year olds. This can include arts arts and crafts, outdoor play and many more.We often bring outside entertainers in which includes our favourite which is circus skills. During the school holidays we often have free trips to various places, e.g Bowood. For information pl
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Swindon
Governance
- 21 November 2007: Standard registration
- 03 April 2012: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 03 April 2012: Funds transferred to 1087034 CLIVEY AND TWIST
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2008 | 30/11/2009 | 30/11/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.22k | £35.88k | £34.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.99k | £29.03k | £30.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2010 | 23 November 2011 | 54 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2010 | 26 April 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 November 2009 | 26 July 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2009 | 12 August 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 November 2008 | 24 November 2009 | 55 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2008 | 19 June 2009 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 22 NOVEMBER 2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 3 JULY 2007.
Charitable objects
3. CHARITY OBJECTS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS IN THE NORTH SWINDON AREA THROUGH PLAY. TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR THE RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS IN THE NORTH SWINDON AREA WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
THE NORTH SWINDON AREA.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window