Financial history UK Music Masters Ltd.

Charity Number: 1119372
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £1.17m £1.08m £1.14m £1.32m £1.44m
Total expenditure £1.07m £1.09m £1.15m £1.26m £1.33m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £24.29k £28.29k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £934.64k £843.11k £921.55k £1.10m £1.19m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £229.95k £235.50k £219.55k £217.94k £231.86k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £548 £115 £239 £6.31k £13.59k
Income - Other £0 £0 £330 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £81.65k £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £832.40k £858.90k £914.45k £1.03m £1.10m
Expenditure - Raising funds £236.47k £231.18k £239.91k £237.13k £231.97k
Expenditure - Governance £7.52k £11.51k £10.17k £13.03k £13.14k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0