UK Music Masters Ltd.

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
MUSIC MASTERS BELIEVES ENABLING OPPORTUNITY, DIVERSITY AND EXCELLENCE IN CLASSICAL MUSIC THAT WILL INSPIRE POSITIVE CHANGE FOR INDIVIDUALS AND COMMUNITIES. IT DELIVERS, MODELS AND IMPROVES ACCESS TO HIGH QUALITY SCHOOL MUSIC EDUCATION, TRAINS MUSIC EDUCATORS UK-WIDE AND ADVOCATES FOR AND DRIVES SYSTEMIC CHANGE TO INCREASE DIVERSITY WITHIN THE MUSIC SECTOR
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income:
£1,439,606
Donations and legacies | £1.19m | |
Charitable activities | £231.86k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £13.59k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£1,327,441
Raising funds | £231.97k | |
Charitable activities | £1.10m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £231.97k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.10m | |
Retained for future use | £112.17k |
People

15 Employee(s)
11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- 24 May 2007: Standard registration
- Music Masters (Working name)
- LONDON MUSIC MASTERS (Previous name)
- THE LONDON INTERNATIONAL VIOLIN COMPETITION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stuart Graeme Mason | Chair | 22 March 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Emma Jayne Chandra | Trustee | 24 January 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Charlotte Alicia Swannell | Trustee | 08 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr Gwyneth Kadiatu Kanneh | Trustee | 22 March 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr Steven Berryman | Trustee | 23 October 2020 |
|
|||||||||
Mary Rebekah Kofokasumu | Trustee | 21 May 2020 |
|
|||||||||
James Anthony Mark JOSEPH | Trustee | 05 December 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Sarah Serena Bunting | Trustee | 27 June 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Philippa Thomas | Trustee | 01 February 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
Talia Sarah Hull | Trustee | 12 September 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
Lady Victoria Susan Hull Robey | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.17m | £1.08m | £1.14m | £1.32m | £1.44m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.07m | £1.09m | £1.15m | £1.26m | £1.33m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £24.29k | £28.29k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £934.64k | £843.11k | £921.55k | £1.10m | £1.19m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £229.95k | £235.50k | £219.55k | £217.94k | £231.86k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £548 | £115 | £239 | £6.31k | £13.59k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £330 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £81.65k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £832.40k | £858.90k | £914.45k | £1.03m | £1.10m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £236.47k | £231.18k | £239.91k | £237.13k | £231.97k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £7.52k | £11.51k | £10.17k | £13.03k | £13.14k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £138.40k | £5.46k | £211.00k | £4.58k | £248.88k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £177.92k | £0 | £202.90k | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £572.94k | £611.48k | £499.70k | £542.40k | £667.75k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £163.97k | £235.03k | £140.41k | £121.02k | £150.98k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 25 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 25 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 23 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 23 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 08 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 08 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 13 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 13 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 09 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 09 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 25 APRIL 2007 AS AMENDED BY WRITTEN RESOLUTION DATED 15 JANUARY 2008. CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 21 JANUARY 2008. as amended on 16 Aug 2020 as amended on 22 Sep 2021 as amended on 17 Jul 2023
Charitable objects
For the public benefit to advance education in and through music in all its forms to improve the lives of children and young people in the UK, in particular but not exclusively by: 1) Increasing equitable access to and opportunity through a high quality music education for children in state primary schools, with a focus on under-served communities 2) Raising the standard of music education, in particular school-based group teaching, through championing and developing music educators 3) Championing and driving the creation of a more open, diverse and inclusive music sector, and pathways into it.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
125 Kennington Road
London
SE11 6SF
- Phone:
- 02036435085
- Email:
- contact@musicmasters.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window