Financial history Creation Theatre Ltd

Charity number: 1119379
Charity reporting is up to date (44 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £768.35k £569.23k £533.09k £425.81k £457.02k
Total expenditure £882.48k £561.29k £592.86k £465.29k £539.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.00k £29.98k £274.48k £15.10k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £70.13k £145.17k £280.13k N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £697.77k £424.01k £252.95k N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment £450 £52 £3 N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £806.06k £527.97k £546.28k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £76.42k £33.33k £46.58k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £4.20k £4.20k £4.20k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A