THE FRIENDS OF KOTU SENIOR SECONDARY SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support for Kotu Senior Secondary School, The Gambia, through financing building developments and the provision of computers, books and other equipment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- The Gambia
Governance
- 16 May 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr ROBERT PERRY THOMPSON | Chair |
|
||||||
Lizzie Nicholls | Trustee | 28 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
CHRIS CHERRY | Trustee | 01 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
ALISON COBBIN | Trustee | 13 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
TIM LINKENS | Trustee |
|
||||||
LYNN ANNE MURPHY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.09k | £7.46k | £3.60k | £1.57k | £4.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.55k | £5.01k | £9.19k | £0 | £1.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 01 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 23 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 15 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 24 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 9 MARCH 2007
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS AND FORMER PUPILS OF KOTU SENIOR SECONDARY SCHOOL, KOTU, THE GAMBIA THROUGH ASSISTANCE WITH THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF SCHOOL FACILITIES, THE PROVISION OF BOOKS AND EDUCATIONAL EQUIPMENT SPONSORSHIP OF INDIVIDUAL STUDENTS AND SUCH OTHER MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
82 WINN ROAD
LONDON
SE12 9EZ
- Phone:
- 02088570497
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window