KIVISI

Charity Number: 1120325
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

TO PURSUE THE CHARITIES OBJECTS WITH ALL RESOURCES AVAILABLE TO THE CHARITY.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024

Total income: £41,451
Total expenditure: £17,862

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Manchester City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 30 July 2007: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rabbi Jakob Wreschner Chair
CHESED
Received: On time
DOR L'DOR
Received: On time
THE WATER TRUST
Received: On time
THE JEWISH DAY PRIMARY SCHOOL
Received: On time
PRESTWICH AHAVAS CHESED
Received: On time
Rebecca Halpern Trustee 07 November 2022
None on record
Dr CAROLE FLORA HARRIS Trustee
None on record
MICHAEL EPSTEIN Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £43.03k £75.52k £38.39k £40.24k £41.45k
Total expenditure £42.63k £63.82k £30.40k £81.97k £17.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2024 24 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2024 24 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2023 28 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 28 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2022 22 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 22 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2021 27 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 27 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 29 February 2020 21 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 21 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
2nd Floor Parkgates
Bury New Road
PRESTWICH
M25 0TL
Phone:
0161 798 1660
Website:

No information available