VISION REDBRIDGE CULTURE AND LEISURE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of a wide range of leisure and cultural facilities across the geographical boundaries of London Borough of Redbridge.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£24,081,000
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £23.59m | |
Other trading activities | £495.00k | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£24,411,000
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £24.41m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £9,340,000 from 1 government contract(s) and £874,000 from 4 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £24.41m |
People

344 Employee(s)
9 Trustee(s)
825 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 7 |
£70k to £80k | 1 |
£80k to £90k | 2 |
£110k to £120k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Redbridge
Governance
- 11 February 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Martin Denis Solder | Chair |
|
||||||||||
Navdeep Kaur Johal | Trustee | 09 September 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Cllr Zulfiqar Hussain | Trustee | 20 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Caroline Janet Ward | Trustee | 21 June 2016 |
|
|
||||||||
Stephen John Wilks | Trustee | 25 January 2016 |
|
|
||||||||
Linda Perham | Trustee | 25 May 2011 |
|
|
||||||||
KEVIN JON PITTMAN | Trustee | 25 May 2011 |
|
|
||||||||
DAVID CHARLES THOROGOOD | Trustee | 25 May 2011 |
|
|
||||||||
CATHERINE JANE ROWAN | Trustee | 25 May 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.06m | £19.17m | £31.36m | £21.29m | £24.08m | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.10m | £18.80m | £22.21m | £22.80m | £24.41m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £9.79m | £9.32m | £9.06m | £8.65m | £9.34m | |
|
Income from government grants | £845.00k | £5.79m | £3.10m | £1.06m | £874.00k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £617.00k | £495.00k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £20.05m | £19.17m | £21.66m | £20.67m | £23.59m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £9.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £9.70m | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £21.10m | £18.80m | £22.21m | £22.80m | £24.41m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £84.00k | £91.00k | £96.00k | £105.00k | £128.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £16.00k | £32.00k | £50.00k | £81.00k | £40.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £887.00k | £1.03m | £1.22m | £1.31m | £1.44m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £3.14m | £4.69m | £13.98m | £2.31m | £1.65m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£8.29m | -£12.74m | -£9.59m | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £2.82m | £3.60m | £2.75m | £2.27m | £2.07m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 25 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 13 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 19 NOV 2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13 DEC 2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15 OCT 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05 APR 2011 as amended on 29 Jun 2021
Charitable objects
THE CHARITABLE COMPANY HAS BEEN ESTABLISHED FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT PRIMARILY FOR THE COMMUNITY OF AND VISITORS TO THE LONDON BOROUGH OF REDBRIDGE AND SURROUNDING AREAS FOR THE FOLLOWING PURPOSES (THE "OBJECTS"). A) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE INCLUDING SWIMMING POOLS, ATHLETIC GROUNDS, PLAYING FIELDS, GOLD COURSES, CYCLING TRACKS, FITNESS CENTRES, RECREATION CENTRES, INDOOR AND OUTDOOR ACTIVITY CENTRES, WATERSPORTS CENTRES, FISHING LAKES, THEATRES AND COMMUNITY CENTRES SUCH FACILITIES BEING PROVIDED TO THE PUBLIC AT LARGE SAVE THAT SPECIAL FACILITIES MAY BE PROVIDED TO THE PERSONS WHO BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES MAY HAVE NEED OR SPECIAL FACILITIES AND SERVICES; AND/OR B) TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH THROUGH COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION; AND/OR C) SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES BENEFICIAL TO THE COMMUNITY CONSISTENT WITH THE OBJECTS ABOVE AS THE DIRECTOR TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF REDBRIDGE
Contact information
- Address:
-
3RD FLOOR
CENTRAL LIBRARY
CLEMENTS ROAD
ILFORD
ESSEX
IG1 1EA
- Phone:
- 0208 708 3354
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window