Financial history STAFFORD TOWN FOOTBALL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1121304
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £2.75k £1.39k £11 £38 £70
Total expenditure £98.52k £98.52k £101.78k £98.51k £98.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A