Financial history REDUCING THE RISK OF DOMESTIC ABUSE

Charity Number: 1120244
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £276.97k £399.92k £466.98k £327.43k £559.99k
Total expenditure £283.79k £360.19k £379.78k £400.81k £524.78k
Income from government contracts N/A £10.80k £98.62k £85.44k £299.00k
Income from government grants N/A £92.54k £54.72k £14.00k £51.00k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £14.61k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £543.37k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £1.47k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £540
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £524.78k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0