Trustees REDUCING THE RISK OF DOMESTIC ABUSE

Charity Number: 1120244
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Paul Richards Chair 01 July 2024
None on record
CATHERINE DOROTHY FOOT Trustee 29 April 2025
BLACKBIRD LEYS NEIGHBOURHOOD SUPPORT SCHEME LTD
Received: On time
Dr Amna Sarwar Trustee 12 February 2025
None on record
Dr Jane Elizabeth Harris Trustee 12 February 2025
None on record
Catherine Kelly-Anne Gray Trustee 17 October 2024
None on record
Sophie Natasha Garner Trustee 17 October 2024
None on record
Ruth Charlotte Hosford Trustee 05 July 2018
None on record
Sally Pauline Dorrity Trustee 04 March 2014
None on record
Naomi Laura Neal Trustee 10 December 2000
None on record