Financial history MARSH LADIES CHOIR

Charity Number: 1121233
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £10.33k £8.29k £13.84k £14.50k £14.84k
Total expenditure £8.17k £2.84k £11.46k £19.49k £14.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A