Financial history THE DAVID ASHWELL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1121783
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £5.61k £5.61k £7.04k £6.87k £2.74k
Total expenditure £5.53k £5.53k £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A