Financial history ACTION FOR DEAFNESS

Charity number: 1122579
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £1.42m £1.55m £2.14m £2.20m £2.01m
Total expenditure £1.49m £1.36m £1.75m £1.99m £2.06m
Income from government contracts N/A £1.37m £2.04m N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £122.47k £31.93k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £106.73k £131.76k £43.70k £18.64k £21.80k
Income - Other trading activities £2.35k £7 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.25m £1.37m £2.04m £2.16m £1.92m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £441 £54 £546 £9.78k £24.25k
Income - Other £62.37k £45.62k £54.04k £13.33k £36.12k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.49m £1.36m £1.75m £1.99m £2.06m
Expenditure - Raising funds £206 £300 £266 £189 £50
Expenditure - Governance £0 £6.07k £0 £0 £63.28k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0