THE LIZ AND TERRY BRAMALL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity supports, through grants, charitable organisations which promote Christian faith in accordance with the beliefs of the Church of England; promotes urban or rural regeneration in areas of social/economic deprivation for the benefit of the public, enhances the lives of those with illness;the advancement of health for public benefit;promotes the arts and promotes the advance of education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
Total income:
£2,534,479
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £2.53m | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£8,819,474
Raising funds | £395.18k | |
Charitable activities | £8.42m | |
Other | £0 |
£9,383,778 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £395.18k | |
Charitable expenditure | £8.42m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £395.18k | |
Charitable expenditure | £8.42m | |
Retained for future use | £3.10m |
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 23 November 2007: Standard registration
- THE LIZ AND TERRY BRAMALL CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANTHONY RICHARD SHARP | Trustee | 18 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
RACHEL SHIRLEY TUNNICLIFFE | Trustee | 18 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
SUZANNAH CLARE ALLARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ELIZABETH BRAMALL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr TERENCE GEORGE BRAMALL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
REBECCA HELEN BLETCHER | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.62m | £2.16m | £2.16m | £2.43m | £2.53m | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.73m | £5.81m | £6.06m | £6.01m | £8.82m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £2.62m | £2.16m | £2.16m | £2.42m | £2.53m | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £11.00k | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £7.12m | £5.35m | £5.64m | £5.59m | £8.42m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £615.91k | £463.66k | £415.52k | £418.45k | £395.18k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £217.62k | £187.22k | £174.09k | £182.63k | £170.94k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £398.29k | £276.44k | £415.52k | £418.45k | £395.18k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | £96.31m | £110.03m | £110.52m | £99.87m | £105.33m | |
|
Other assets | £3.53m | £4.97m | £5.05m | £5.49m | £4.38m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £165.91k | £145.20k | £740.12k | £580.86k | £1.83m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 01 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 01 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 03 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 03 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 08 February 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 25 February 2021 | 20 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 06/07/2007 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 27/01/2009 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 30/12/2009 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 17/03/2011
Charitable objects
2.2 THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE CAPITAL AND INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND UPON TRUST TO APPLY THE INCOME, AND ALL OR SUCH PART OR PARTS OF THE CAPITAL. AT SUCH TIMES, IN SUCH MANNER, AND SUBJECT TO SUCH RESTRICTIONS (IF ANY), AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT FOR OR TOWARDS: A. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENTS OF BELIEF OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND; AND B. THE PROMOTION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC OF URBAN OR RURAL REGENERATION IN AREAS OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: (A) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP: (B) THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT: (C) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, TRAINING OR RETRAINING, PARTICULARLY AMONG UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE, AND PROVIDING UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE WITH WORK EXPERIENCE: (D) THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, TECHNICAL ASSISTANCE OR BUSINESS ADVICE OR CONSULTANCY IN ORDER TO PROVIDE TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES FOR UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE IN CASES OF FINANCIAL OR OTHER CHARITABLE NEED THROUGH HELP: (I) IN SETTING UP THEIR OWN BUSINESS, OR (II) TO EXISTING BUSINESSES: (E) THE CREATION OF TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES BY THE PROVISION OF WORKSPACE BUILDINGS, AND/OR LAND FOR USE ON FAVOURABLE TERMS: (F) THE PROVISION OF HOUSING FOR THOSE WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED AND THE IMPROVEMENT OF HOUSING IN THE PUBLIC SECTOR OR IN CHARITABLE OWNERSHIP PROVIDED THAT SUCH POWER SHALL NOT EXTEND TO RELIEVING ANY LOCAL AUTHORITIES OR OTHER BODIES OF A STATUTORY DUTY TO PROVIDE OR IMPROVE HOUSING: (G) THE MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT OR PROVISION OF PUBLIC AMENITIES: (H) THE PRESERVATION OF BUILDINGS OR SITES OF HISTORIC OR ARCHITECTURAL IMPORTANCE: (I) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE OR THOSE WHO BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES: (J) THE PROTECTION OR CONSERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT: (K) THE PROVISION OF PUBLIC HEALTH FACILITIES AND CHILDCARE: (L) THE PROMOTION OF PUBLIC SAFETY AND PREVENTION OF CRIME: (M) SUCH OTHER MEANS AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED SUBJECT TO THE PRIOR WRITTEN CONSENT OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS FOR ENGLAND AND WALES. (C) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE: NATIONALLY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O RAWORTHS LLP
ETON HOUSE
89 STATION PARADE
HARROGATE
HG1 1HF
- Phone:
- 01423566666
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window