Financial history KING'S CHURCH EDEN

Charity Number: 1120962
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £37.03k £36.67k £47.70k £71.18k £87.44k
Total expenditure £36.61k £33.79k £51.37k £69.62k £84.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £3.01k