Financial history THE SACCONI TRUST

Charity number: 1122465
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £108.07k £99.66k £56.24k £126.03k £133.61k
Total expenditure £45.04k £105.66k £111.00k £118.93k £129.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A