COLNE OPEN DOOR CENTRE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Drop-in not for profit community cafe, providing low cost nutritious meals. Provide volunteer placements in the cafe. We have a drop-in facility to help with any problems including budgeting, formfilling, counselling, listening ear, use of phone, help with findind housing, help with sorting utility problems etc. We serve the marginalized in our society. Counselling, training and support groups
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
38 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Lancashire
Governance
- 11 October 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Westley Evans | Chair | 11 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Waddington | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Simon Fielding | Trustee | 11 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kerry Fielding | Trustee | 11 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
MADELINE Shaw | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £89.57k | £171.78k | £115.89k | £199.18k | £221.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £128.35k | £107.52k | £141.81k | £178.66k | £219.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £5.00k | £5.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £21.25k | £17.93k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 19 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 25 APRIL 2007
Charitable objects
PROMOTE ANY OR ALL PURPOSES DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE, PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY OF COLNE AND DISTRICT AND IN PARTICULAR FOR THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, DISTRESS, SICKNESS, DISABILITY, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE FURTHERANCE OF HEALTH AND ALL OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, RACE COLOUR, AGE, POLITICS, CREED OR OTHER OPINIONS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LANCASHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
OPEN DOOR
1 GREAT GEORGE STREET
COLNE
BB8 0SY
- Phone:
- 01282 860342
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window