THE PERSE SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The aims of the Perse School are the advancement of education by the provision and conduct of the School known as The Perse School Cambridge. The School aims to provide financial assistance to pupils between the ages of 7 and 18 whose families could not otherwise afford the fees, thereby allowing access to the widest possible social spectrum.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income:
£35,126,000
Donations and legacies | £242.00k | |
Charitable activities | £33.27m | |
Other trading activities | £929.00k | |
Investments | £685.00k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£31,217,000
Raising funds | £192.00k | |
Charitable activities | £30.81m | |
Other | £216.00k |
£14,000 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £408.00k | |
Charitable expenditure | £30.81m | |
Retained for future use | £3.91m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £408.00k | |
Charitable expenditure | £30.81m | |
Retained for future use | £3.92m |
People

374 Employee(s)
16 Trustee(s)
32 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 35 |
£70k to £80k | 15 |
£80k to £90k | 4 |
£90k to £100k | 3 |
£110k to £120k | 2 |
£120k to £130k | 1 |
£150k to £200k | 1 |
£250k to £300k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 21 November 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jonathan Willoughby Scott MA | Chair | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Cristina Elena Bota | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Martin Anthony Richard Collier | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|||||
DAVID SINCLAIR FERGUSON | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
DR JASON DEREK HAWKES | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Angela Yin-Chiu Au FCA MA | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Michael Finlayson-Brown BA Hons | Trustee | 28 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sally Ann Shakir-Khalil MA Law | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Susan Elizabeth Freestone DLMEd GRSM | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Professor Alexander Duncan Oliver PhD LittD | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Patrick Hancock MA LLM KC | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Denise Williams FRCP FRPCH | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
SIMON DAVID LEBUS MA | Trustee | 07 December 2017 |
|
|||||
Graeme John Proudfoot BA Oxon | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM MARK DAWKINS BA Cantab | Trustee | 06 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN CHEVELEY ROBERTS MA | Trustee | 01 December 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.44m | £28.37m | £29.82m | £32.44m | £35.13m | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.46m | £24.57m | £25.70m | £28.36m | £31.22m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £478.72k | £180.20k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £560.00k | £413.00k | £212.00k | £286.00k | £242.00k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £466.00k | £305.00k | £139.00k | £630.00k | £929.00k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £27.21m | £26.96m | £29.12m | £31.31m | £33.27m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £4.00k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £206.00k | £212.00k | £175.00k | £207.00k | £685.00k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £479.00k | £180.00k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £9.25k | £39.00k | £0 | £7.51k | £20.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £23.89m | £24.32m | £25.54m | £28.13m | £30.81m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £269.00k | £179.00k | £160.00k | £205.00k | £192.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £41.97k | £28.00k | £12.00k | £13.00k | £4.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £38.00k | £13.00k | £27.00k | £59.00k | £62.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £305.00k | £75.00k | £6.00k | £28.00k | £216.00k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £52.04m | £52.29m | £52.75m | £52.46m | £57.73m | |
|
Long-term investments | £5.80m | £5.91m | £10.82m | £10.71m | £10.70m | |
|
Other assets | £11.78m | £14.07m | £13.48m | £16.77m | £17.11m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £14.70m | £13.55m | £13.84m | £12.76m | £14.45m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 23 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 23 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 20 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 20 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 13 MARCH 2008 AND 10 DECEMBER 2009 AND 26/614 AND 9/8/14
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION BY THE PROVISION AND CONDUCT OF THE SCHOOL KNOWN AS THE PERSE SCHOOL CAMBRIDGE TOGETHER WITH WITH ANY OF ITS AFFILIATED OR SUBSIDIARY SCHOOLS (HOWSOEVER THE SAME SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME BE KNOWN) AND BY ANCILLARY OR INCIDENTAL EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES AND ANY OTHER ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY AS A WHOLE.
Area of benefit
CAMBRIDGE
Linked charities
- A A TILLYARD MEMORIAL PRIZE
- A C HAWKINS PRIZE
- AGATHA GRAHAM LIBRARY TRUST
- BARNET BEALES PRIZE
- BATESON NATURAL SCIENCE PRIZE
- CATHARINE SARAH TILLYARD MEMORIAL PRIZE FUND
- CULLEN JUNIOR SCHOOL PRIZE FOR ARITHMETIC
- E SAVILLE PECK PRIZE
- E WINIFRED BIRKS PRIZE FOR MATHEMATICS
- ELLEN MARGARET GWATKIN PRIZE FOR ENGLISH LITERATURE
- FITZPATRICK MEMORIAL PRIZE
- G B BOWES PRIZE
- GRETA ARMSTRONG MORGAN MEMORIAL PRIZE FOR GEOGRAPHY
- H S R LINDEMAN PRIZE FOR MATHEMATICS
- HELEN GRANT PRIZE FUND
- HELEN VALENTINE MEMORIAL PRIZE FOR GEOGRAPHY
- JOHN E FEW PRIZES
- JOHN WESLEY WOOTON PRIZE
- KATE HARDING STREET MEMORIAL PRIZE FOR LITERATURE
- M AUDREY SCOTT ART PRIZE FUND
- M AUDREY SCOTT MUSIC PRIZE FUND
- MACFARLANE - GRIEVE PRIZE
- MALLARD LOWER SIXTH SCIENCE AND MATHEMATICS PRIZE
- MARY BARR LIBRARY FUND
- MASON MATHEMATICS AND ATHLETICS PRIZE
- MAURICE S C COOPER SCHOLARSHIP
- MAURICE WOLLMAN PRIZE
- MR AND MRS A E E MCKENZIE PRIZE FOR ENGLISH
- PERSE SCHOOL ENDOWMENT
- PETER LAPWOOD TRAVEL BURSARY
- PYE BURSARY THE PERSE SCHOOL FOR BOYS, CAMBRIDGE
- ROUSE TRAVEL SCHOLARSHIPS
- THE BLYTHE PRIZE FOR MUSIC
- THE CAMBRIDGESHIRE COUNTY COUNCIL PERSE SCHOOL FOR BOYS BURSARIES FUND
- THE CAMBRIDGESHIRE COUNTY COUNCIL PERSE SCHOOL FOR GIRLS BURSARIES FUND
- THE COX PRIZE FOR NEEDLEWORK
- THE DAVID HOWIE AND JAMES PERRETT MEMORIAL TRAVELLING SCHOLARSHIP
- THE DOUGLAS BROWN MEMORIAL PRIZE FOR ENGLISH
- THE ELIZABETH GARRAT PRIZE FOR RECITATION IN ENGLISH
- THE HARRISON PRIZE FOR ORIGINAL WORK IN ENGLISH
- THE MICHAEL FARRELL BURSARY THE PERSE SCHOOL FOR BOYS, CAMBRIDGE
- THE PYE BURSARY THE PERSE SCHOOL FOR GIRLS, CAMBRIDGE
- W H D ROUSE PRIZE
- W W ROUSE BALL PRIZE
- 21 November 2007 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE PERSE SCHOOL
HILLS ROAD
CAMBRIDGE
CB2 8QF
- Phone:
- 01223403874
- Email:
- schooloffice@perse.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window